Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominik Mayer

Deceased

Bishop of Austria, Military

Titular Bishop of Cisamus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1809BornRöschitz
19 Jul 183425.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
22 Jul 183425.0Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
1 Oct 186354.2AppointedBishop of Austria, Military
1 Oct 186354.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cisamus
13 Dec 186354.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cisamus
4 May 187565.8DiedBishop of Austria, Military

MicroData Summary for Dominik Mayer:
Bishop Dominik Mayer (born , died ) Bishop of Austria, Military

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 205

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013