Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop László Bíró de Kezdi-Polany

Deceased

Bishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1806BornNagysomkút
1 Oct 182923.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Dec 182923.9Ordained PriestPriest
28 Dec 186661.0SelectedBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
22 Feb 186761.1ConfirmedBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
11 Apr 186761.3Ordained BishopBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
21 Jan 187266.0DiedBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania

MicroData Summary for László Bíró de Kezdi-Polany:
Bishop László Bíró de Kezdi-Polany (born , died ) Bishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1870
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 532
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,130

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013