Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthäus Joseph Binder

Deceased

Bishop of Sankt Pölten


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1822BornMaria Laach
20 Jul 184623.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Sankt Pölten, Austria
23 Jul 184623.9Ordained PriestPriest of Sankt Pölten, Austria
7 Oct 187250.1SelectedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
23 Dec 187250.3ConfirmedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
9 Feb 187350.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
14 Aug 189371.0DiedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria

MicroData Summary for Matthäus Joseph Binder:
Bishop Matthäus Joseph Binder (born , died ) Bishop of Sankt Pölten

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 307

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013