Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rudolf von Thysebaert

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc

Titular Bishop of Tiberias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1798BornSalzburg, Austria
13 Aug 182224.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Aug 182224.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 May 184244.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
23 May 184244.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberias
24 Jul 184244.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberias
12 May 186870.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Rudolf von Thysebaert (VIAF: 169218792)
Bishop Rudolf von Thysebaert (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 369
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 Nov 2016