Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emanuel Jan Schöbel, O.Cr. †

Deceased

Bishop of Litoměřice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1824BornRadowenz
12 Jul 184824.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Knights of the Cross with the Red Star
16 Jul 184824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Knights of the Cross with the Red Star
1879²54.8AppointedGrand Master of Knights of the Cross with the Red Star
30 Apr 188258.2SelectedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
3 Jul 188258.3ConfirmedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
6 Aug 188258.4Ordained BishopBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
28 Nov 190985.7DiedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Emanuel Jan Schöbel:
Bishop Emanuel Jan Schöbel O.Cr. (born , died ) Bishop of Litoměřice

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 347

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 11 May 2015