Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frantisek Borgia Krásl

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

Titular Bishop of Eleutheropolis in Macedonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1844BornKrálové Dvur
10 Jul 187025.5Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
27 Jul 190156.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
27 Jul 190156.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Eleutheropolis in Macedonia
8 Sep 190156.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eleutheropolis in Macedonia
27 Jul 190762.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Frantisek Borgia Krásl:
Bishop Frantisek Borgia Krásl (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 257
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013