Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Josef Říha

Deceased

Bishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1839Born
25 Jul 186222.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
27 Jul 186222.7Ordained PriestPriest of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
7 Jul 188545.6SelectedBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
27 Jul 188545.7ConfirmedBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
6 Sep 188545.8Ordained BishopBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
7 Feb 190767.2DiedBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Martin Josef Říha (VIAF: 83888196)
Bishop Martin Josef Říha (born , died ) Bishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWoslow, Diocese of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}
Ordained BishopBudweiss, Diocese of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Catholic Encyclopedia
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 161
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 May 2017