Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Václav Antonín (Wenzel Anton) Frind

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Gadara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1843Born
29 Jun 186623.4Ordained PriestPriest of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
27 Jul 190158.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
27 Jul 190158.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Gadara
8 Sep 190158.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gadara
2 Aug 193289.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Václav Antonín (Wenzel Anton) Frind (VIAF: 81689317)
Bishop Václav Antonín (Wenzel Anton) Frind (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHaňspach (Lipová), Diocese of Litoměřice
Ordained BishopSt. Guy, Cathedral, Praha, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}
Death PlaceChotěšv
Buried Place (Original)Haňspach (Lipová), Diocese of Litoměřice

  • a priest for 66.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 279
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1901, Number 51
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Number 3,878

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Feb 2021

Quantcast