Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Jindrich Gross

Deceased

Bishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1866Born
4 Jul 188922.7Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
18 Apr 191043.5AppointedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
22 May 191043.6Ordained BishopBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
21 Jan 193164.2DiedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Josef Jindrich Gross
Bishop Josef Jindrich Gross (born , died ) Bishop of Litoměřice

EventPlace
Birth PlacePfraumberg

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018