Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonín Čech

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Litoměřice

Titular Bishop of Cidyessus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1860BornLitoměřice
11 May 188424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
3 Jan 192362.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
3 Jan 192362.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cidyessus
29 Apr 192363.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cidyessus
26 Aug 192969.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Antonín Čech:
Bishop Antonín Čech (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Litoměřice

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 20
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: CB, 18 Jul 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,830

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Sep 2013