Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Théodore Kohn

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Olomouc, Czech Republic

Titular Archbishop of Pelusium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1845Born
5 Jul 187126.2Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc, Czech Republic
16 Jan 189347.8AppointedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
5 Feb 189347.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
12 Feb 189347.8InstalledArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
10 Jun 190459.2ResignedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
10 Jun 190459.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pelusium
3 Dec 191570.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Olomouc, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Théodore Kohn
Archbishop Théodore Kohn (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Olomouc

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBřeznice, Archdiocese of Olomouc
Ordained BishopCathedral, Olomouc, Archdiocese of Olomouc

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,930
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 425
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018