Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Wuschanski

Deceased

Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Samos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1839Born
22 Sep 186626.8Ordained PriestPriest of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
16 Jan 190464.1AppointedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
16 Jan 190464.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Samos
19 Mar 190464.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samos
28 Dec 190566.1DiedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Georg Wuschanski
Bishop Georg Wuschanski (born , died ) Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOstro

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1904, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast