Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Glosauer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

Titular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1860BornSchweissing
15 Jul 188424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
7 Jul 191757.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
7 Jul 191757.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior
8 Sep 191757.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior
9 Jun 192665.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Georg Glosauer:
Bishop Georg Glosauer (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015