Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pavel Huyn

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}

Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1868BornBrno
7 Jun 189224.3Ordained PriestPriest
17 Apr 190436.2SelectedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
14 May 190436.2ConfirmedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
26 Jun 190436.4Ordained BishopBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
29 Jun 190436.4InstalledBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
4 Oct 191648.6AppointedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
8 Dec 191648.8InstalledArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
6 Sep 191951.6ResignedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
6 Sep 191951.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Serdica
13 Jun 192153.3AppointedPatriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
1 Oct 194678.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Pavel Huyn:
Archbishop Pavel Huyn (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 42.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 Oct 2011
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 45, and Page 94
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013