Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurenz Mayer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

Titular Bishop of Dioclea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1828Born
5 Aug 185325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
11 Jan 189970.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
11 Jan 189970.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Dioclea
22 Jan 189970.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dioclea
13 May 191283.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

MicroData Summary for Laurenz Mayer (VIAF: 233246184)
Bishop Laurenz Mayer (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarkgrafneusiedl, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}
Ordained BishopWien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 246
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017