Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Godfried Marschall

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

Titular Bishop of Orthosias in Caria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1840BornNeudorf
24 Jul 186423.8Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
15 Apr 190160.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
15 Apr 190160.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Caria
12 May 190160.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Caria
23 Mar 191170.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

MicroData Summary for Godfried Marschall:
Bishop Godfried Marschall (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 428
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 19 Jul 2015