Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Baptist Schneider

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

Titular Bishop of Parnassus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1840Born
19 Jul 186424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
25 Jun 189656.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
25 Jun 189656.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Parnassus
23 Aug 189656.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Parnassus
27 Jan 190564.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

MicroData Summary for Johann Baptist Schneider (VIAF: 37993669)
Bishop Johann Baptist Schneider (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGaunersdorf, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}
Ordained BishopSankt Stefan, Cathedral, Wien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 442
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1896, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast