Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Emidio Cardinal Taliani

Deceased

Official of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1838BornMontegallo, Italy
20 Oct 186123.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 189658.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sebastea
29 Jun 189658.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Sebastea
24 Jul 189658.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
22 Jun 190365.2Elevated to Cardinal
12 Nov 190365.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
24 Aug 190769.3DiedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Emidio Taliani:
Cardinal Emidio Taliani (born , died ) Official of Roman Curia - Other

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
  • a cardinal for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Jun 1903
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 506, and Page 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013