Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edmund Stonor

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Trapezus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1831Born
13 Apr 185625.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Feb 188957.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Trapezus
24 Feb 188957.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Trapezus
28 Feb 191280.9DiedTitular Archbishop of Trapezus

MicroData Summary for Edmund Stonor
Archbishop Edmund Stonor (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Trapezus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStonor, Diocese of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni in Laterano, Cathedral Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 562
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 13
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 91, Number 7,715

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 30 Nov 2020

Quantcast