Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Donato Maria Cardinal Dell’Olio

Deceased

Archbishop of Benevento, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1847Born
23 Dec 187123.9Ordained PriestPriest of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie), Italy
14 Dec 189143.9AppointedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
20 Dec 189143.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
5 Feb 189850.1AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
15 Apr 190153.3Elevated to Cardinal
18 Apr 190153.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
18 Jan 190254.0DiedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Donato Maria Dell’Olio (VIAF: 304912170)
Donato Maria Cardinal Dell’Olio (born , died ) Archbishop of Benevento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBisceglie, Archdiocese of Trani e Nazareth e Bisceglie
Ordained PriestBisceglie, Archdiocese of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie)
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceBenevento, Archdiocese of Benevento
Buried Place (Original)S. Clementina, Benevento, Archdiocese of Benevento

  • a priest for 30.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
  • a cardinal for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Apr 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 147, and Page 486
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 46
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017