Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Bautista Castro

Deceased

Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1846BornCaracas
30 Dec 190357.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
30 Dec 190357.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Serrae
6 Jan 190457.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Serrae
31 May 190457.6SucceededArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
7 Aug 191568.8DiedArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Juan Bautista Castro:
Archbishop Juan Bautista Castro (born , died ) Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2+: CB
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1904, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015