Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Rodríguez y Obregón

Deceased

Bishop of Barquisimeto, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1833Born
9 Sep 186027.3Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 189461.0AppointedBishop of Barquisimeto, Venezuela
13 Jan 189561.6Ordained BishopBishop of Barquisimeto, Venezuela
1901¹67.6DiedBishop of Barquisimeto, Venezuela

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Rodríguez y Obregón
Bishop Gregorio Rodríguez y Obregón (born , died 1901) Bishop of Barquisimeto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMacarao, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
Ordained BishopCathedral, Caracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 142
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017