Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Barquisimeto

Archidioecesis Barquisimetensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 30 April 1966
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Venezuela
  • Square Kilometers: 9,223 (3,562 Square Miles)
  • Description: Part of Lara
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquidiocesisdebarquisimeto.org.ve/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Arquidiocesana, Av. Libertador entre Av. Argimiro Bracamonte y Av. Lopez Contreras, Sector Pataratan, Municipio Iribarren, Parroquia Catedral, Barquisimeto, 3001 Edo. Lara, Venezuela
  • Telephone: (0251)420.01.00
  • Fax: 420.01.49

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Barquisimeto
7 March 1863ErectedDiocese of Mérida Diocese of Barquisimeto (erected)
Diocese of Coro
14 August 1867Name ChangedDiocese of Barquisimeto Diocese of Coro
Diocese of Barquisimeto
22 October 1869Name ChangedDiocese of Coro Diocese of Barquisimeto
12 October 1922Territory LostDiocese of Barquisimeto Diocese of Coro (erected)
7 June 1954Territory LostDiocese of Barquisimeto
Diocese of Calabozo
Diocese of Guanare (erected)
Archdiocese of Barquisimeto
30 April 1966ElevatedDiocese of Barquisimeto Archdiocese of Barquisimeto
7 October 1966Territory LostArchdiocese of Barquisimeto
Diocese of Valencia en Venezuela
Diocese of San Felipe (erected)
25 July 1992Territory LostArchdiocese of Barquisimeto Diocese of Carora (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Barquisimeto
1950640,000710,00090.1%4522679,552913950ap1951
1955502,820.0%4438820388052ap1960
Archdiocese of Barquisimeto
1966497,650509,47897.7%68571253,9817118357ap1967
1970565,000580,00097.4%78581364,1546820067ap1971*
1976712,306755,64494.3%79621415,05117620773ap1977
1980800,900836,70095.7%77711485,41129325579ap1981
19901,194,2191,243,97896.0%87751627,371211925690ap1991
19991,690,0001,800,00093.9%946716110,496129526079ap2000
20001,690,0001,800,00093.9%986716510,242129526079ap2001
20011,000,0001,340,79574.6%111781895,2911413827980ap2002
20021,000,0001,440,26569.4%103711745,7471312627983ap2003
20031,098,0001,581,12169.4%115581736,346178028583ap2004
20041,120,1021,720,01065.1%119611806,222198724585ap2005
20061,142,5041,754,41065.1%124651896,044229624583ap2007
20121,433,0001,941,00073.8%954413910,3092911822090ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 8 Sep 2013