Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Polito Rodríguez Méndez

Bishop of San Carlos de Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1967 Born
31 Jul 199931.9Ordained PriestPriest of Barinas, Venezuela
8 Apr 201648.6AppointedBishop of San Carlos de Venezuela
18 Jun 201648.8Ordained BishopBishop of San Carlos de Venezuela
25 Jun 201648.8InstalledBishop of San Carlos de Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Polito Rodríguez Méndez
Bishop Polito Rodríguez Méndez (born ) Bishop of San Carlos de Venezuela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Bárbara

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Carlos de Venezuela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2016
  • ob/c2+: CB, 10 Apr 2016
  • ob/i: CB, 21 Apr 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,942

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 24 Sep 2017