Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Luis Azuaje Ayala

Archbishop of Maracaibo, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1957 Born
5 May 198426.4Ordained PriestPriest of Trujillo, Venezuela
18 Mar 199941.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barquisimeto, Venezuela
18 Mar 199941.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Italica
29 May 199941.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Italica
15 Jul 200648.6AppointedBishop of El Vigia-San Carlos del Zulia, Venezuela
23 Sep 200648.7InstalledBishop of El Vigia-San Carlos del Zulia, Venezuela
30 Aug 201355.7AppointedBishop of Barinas, Venezuela
24 May 201860.4AppointedArchbishop of Maracaibo, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for José Luis Azuaje Ayala
Archbishop José Luis Azuaje Ayala (born ) Archbishop of Maracaibo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValera, Diocese of Trujillo
Ordained BishopSan Juan Bautista, Church, Valera, Diocese of Trujillo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Maracaibo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2006
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,564
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Aug 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 5 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Oct 2018

Quantcast