Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Luis Enrique Rojas Ruiz

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Mérida, Venezuela

Titular Bishop of Unizibira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1968 Born
15 Sep 199931.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mérida, Venezuela
19 Jun 201748.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mérida, Venezuela
19 Jun 201748.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Unizibira
29 Sep 201749.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Unizibira

MicroData Summary for Luis Enrique Rojas Ruiz
Father Luis Enrique Rojas Ruiz (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Mérida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMérida, Archdiocese of Mérida
Ordained BishopCathedral, Mérida, Archdiocese of Mérida

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Mérida.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2017
  • ob/c2+: CB, 19 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jun 2017