Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Alfredo Cabezas Mendoza

Bishop of Punto Fijo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1966 BornNiquitao
10 Jun 199024.3Ordained PriestPriest of Trujillo, Venezuela
4 Jun 201650.3AppointedBishop of Punto Fijo, Venezuela
6 Aug 201650.5Ordained BishopBishop of Punto Fijo, Venezuela
14 Aug 201650.5InstalledBishop of Punto Fijo, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Carlos Alfredo Cabezas Mendoza
Bishop Carlos Alfredo Cabezas Mendoza (born ) Bishop of Punto Fijo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Punto Fijo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Jun 2016
  • ob/i: CB, 10 Jun 2016
  • c4: CB, 6 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Aug 2016