Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor Hugo Basabe

Bishop of San Felipe, Venezuela

Apostolic Administrator of Barquisimeto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1961 Born
15 Aug 200038.6Ordained PriestPriest of El Vigia-San Carlos del Zulia, Venezuela
11 Mar 201654.2AppointedBishop of San Felipe, Venezuela
21 May 201654.4Ordained BishopBishop of San Felipe, Venezuela
5 Oct 201856.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Barquisimeto, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Victor Hugo Basabe
Bishop Victor Hugo Basabe (born ) Bishop of San Felipe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBobures
Ordained BishopCathedral, San Felipe, Diocese of San Felipe

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Felipe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Mar 2016
  • c1: CB, 11 Mar 2016
  • ob/c2+: CB, 10 Apr 2016
  • c4: CB, 20 May 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,915
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 5 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Oct 2018

Quantcast