Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nelson Antonio Martinez Rust

Bishop Emeritus of San Felipe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1944 BornPuerto Cabello
15 Dec 196824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia en Venezuela
8 Jan 198237.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia en Venezuela
8 Jan 198237.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Bararus
25 Mar 198237.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bararus
29 Feb 199247.7AppointedBishop of San Felipe, Venezuela
11 Mar 201671.7ResignedBishop of San Felipe, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Nelson Antonio Martinez Rust
Bishop Nelson Antonio Martinez Rust (born ) Bishop Emeritus of San Felipe

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Felipe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016