Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario del Valle Moronta Rodríguez

Bishop of San Cristóbal de Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1949 BornCaracas
19 Apr 197526.2Ordained PriestPriest of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
4 Apr 199041.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
4 Apr 199041.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Nova
27 May 199041.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nova
2 Dec 199546.8AppointedBishop of Los Teques, Venezuela
14 Apr 199950.2AppointedBishop of San Cristóbal de Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Mario del Valle Moronta Rodríguez:
Bishop Mario del Valle Moronta Rodríguez (born ) Bishop of San Cristóbal de Venezuela

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Cristóbal de Venezuela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 11 Jul 2014