Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Anibal Quintero Chacón

Bishop of Barcelona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1956 BornQueniquea
27 Jun 198124.9Ordained PriestPriest of San Cristóbal de Venezuela
19 Dec 200852.4AppointedBishop of Margarita, Venezuela
7 Mar 200952.6Ordained BishopBishop of Margarita, Venezuela
14 Mar 200952.6InstalledBishop of Margarita, Venezuela
11 Jul 201457.9AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Jorge Anibal Quintero Chacón:
Bishop Jorge Anibal Quintero Chacón (born ) Bishop of Barcelona

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Barcelona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Dec 2008
  • ob/i/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,060
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015