Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mariano José Parra Sandoval

Archbishop of Coro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1947 BornMaracaibo
14 Aug 197124.3Ordained PriestPriest of Cumaná, Venezuela
12 Jul 199447.2AppointedBishop of San Fernando de Apure, Venezuela
28 Oct 199447.5Ordained BishopBishop of San Fernando de Apure, Venezuela
10 Jul 200154.2AppointedBishop of Ciudad Guayana, Venezuela
25 Oct 201669.5AppointedArchbishop of Coro, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Mariano José Parra Sandoval
Archbishop Mariano José Parra Sandoval (born ) Archbishop of Coro

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Coro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,448
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 Oct 2016