Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ulises Antonio Gutiérrez Reyes, O. de M.

Archbishop of Ciudad Bolívar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1951 BornPedregal
27 Dec 197726.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
5 Dec 200352.6AppointedBishop of Carora, Venezuela
27 Feb 200452.8Ordained BishopBishop of Carora, Venezuela
6 Mar 200452.9InstalledBishop of Carora, Venezuela
27 Aug 201160.3AppointedArchbishop of Ciudad Bolívar, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Ulises Antonio Gutiérrez Reyes:
Archbishop Ulises Antonio Gutiérrez Reyes O. de M. (born ) Archbishop of Ciudad Bolívar

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Ciudad Bolívar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Aug 2011
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 148
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,539

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013