Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduardo Herrera Riera

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Carora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1927BornCarora
8 Dec 195528.3Ordained PriestPriest of Barquisimeto, Venezuela
7 Jan 196537.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cumaná, Venezuela
7 Jan 196537.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sesta
25 Mar 196537.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sesta
30 Nov 196639.2AppointedBishop of Guanare, Venezuela
31 Oct 197043.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barquisimeto, Venezuela
31 Oct 197043.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Ubaza
5 Jul 199466.8AppointedBishop of Carora, Venezuela
5 Dec 200376.2RetiredBishop of Carora, Venezuela
27 Oct 201285.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Carora, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Herrera Riera:
Bishop Eduardo Herrera Riera (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Carora

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 47.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • d: CB, 27 Oct 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013