Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Antonio Ponte

Deceased

Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1832Born
23 Dec 185422.5Ordained PriestPriest
29 Sep 187644.2AppointedArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
30 Nov 187644.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
6 Nov 188351.3DiedArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

MicroData Summary for José Antonio Ponte (VIAF: 89363139)
Archbishop José Antonio Ponte (born , died ) Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCabudare, Diocese of Coro
Ordained BishopSan Francisco, Caracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a priest for 28.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 315
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017