Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rocco Cocchia, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Chieti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1830BornCesinali
184615.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
185322.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
17 Jul 187444.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Oropus
26 Jul 187444.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oropus
28 Jul 187444.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Dominican Republic
28 Jul 187444.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Haiti
28 Jul 187444.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Venezuela
28 Jul 187444.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
15 Jul 187848.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Siraces
9 Aug 188353.3AppointedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
6 May 188454.0AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Brazil
23 May 188757.1AppointedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
19 Dec 190171.6DiedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Rocco Cocchia:
Archbishop Rocco Cocchia O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Archbishop of Chieti

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 311, and Page 428
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 522, and Page 545

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013