Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Maria de Lorenzo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mileto

Titular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1835BornReggio di Calabria
21 May 186529.7Ordained PriestPriest
11 Feb 188953.4AppointedBishop of Mileto, Italy
17 Feb 188953.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mileto, Italy
15 Apr 188953.6InstalledBishop of Mileto, Italy
28 Nov 189863.2ResignedBishop of Mileto, Italy
28 Nov 189863.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
2 Nov 190368.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Mileto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria de Lorenzo:
Archbishop Antonio Maria de Lorenzo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mileto

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 383, and Page 511

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013