Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Evangelista (Michael Antonio) di Milia, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lecce


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1842BornCalitri
31 Jan 186422.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
17 Jul 186422.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
11 Feb 188947.1AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
17 Feb 188947.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
10 Nov 189856.8AppointedBishop of Lecce, Italy
17 Sep 190159.7DiedBishop of Lecce, Italy

MicroData Summary for Evangelista (Michael Antonio) di Milia:
Bishop Evangelista (Michael Antonio) di Milia O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Lecce

  • a priest for 37.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 189, and Page 342

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013