Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Matteoli

Deceased

Bishop of Livorno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1841BornCastelfranco di Sotto
21 May 186422.7Ordained PriestPriest
11 Feb 188947.5AppointedBishop of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy
17 Feb 188947.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy
22 Jun 189654.8AppointedBishop of Pescia, Italy
24 Mar 189856.6AppointedBishop of Livorno, Italy
25 Jul 190058.9DiedBishop of Livorno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio Matteoli:
Bishop Giulio Matteoli (born , died ) Bishop of Livorno

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 342, and Page 456
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 523

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013