Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Aurelio Zonghi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jesi, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Stauropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1830Born
5 Mar 185524.9Ordained PriestPriest of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy
11 Feb 188958.8AppointedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
17 Feb 188958.8Ordained BishopBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
12 Jun 189363.2AppointedBishop of Jesi, Italy
9 Jan 190271.7ResignedBishop of Jesi, Italy
9 Jan 190271.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Stauropolis
27 Jun 190272.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Jesi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Aurelio Zonghi (VIAF: 61536413)
Archbishop Aurelio Zonghi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jesi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFabriano, Diocese of Fabriano e Matelica
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 79, and Page 516
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 528
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017