Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raphael Valenza

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Chieti, Italy

Titular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1818Born
1 Apr 184324.8Ordained PriestPriest of Chieti, Italy
24 May 188970.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chieti, Italy
24 May 188970.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior
9 Jun 188971.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior
22 Dec 189779.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raphael Valenza
Bishop Raphael Valenza (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chieti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChieti, Archdiocese of Chieti
Ordained BishopCathedral, Chieti, Archdiocese of Chieti

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 304
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017