Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor José Díez Navarrete

Deceased

Bishop of Barquisimeto, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1818Born
6 Feb 184223.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
13 Feb 184223.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 186849.6AppointedBishop of Coro, Venezuela
8 Nov 186850.0Ordained BishopBishop of Coro, Venezuela
13 Oct 189374.9DiedBishop of Barquisimeto, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Victor José Díez Navarrete (VIAF: 304917742)
Bishop Victor José Díez Navarrete (born , died ) Bishop of Barquisimeto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoro, Diocese of Coro
Ordained BishopCathedral, Caracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 142
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Feb 2017