Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrique María Dubuc Moreno

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Barquisimeto, Venezuela

Titular Bishop of Maximiana in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1886Born
16 May 191225.6Ordained PriestPriest
10 May 192639.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Barquisimeto, Venezuela
10 May 192639.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Zaraï
15 Aug 192639.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zaraï
26 Sep 192639.9SucceededBishop of Barquisimeto, Venezuela
17 Nov 194761.1ResignedBishop of Barquisimeto, Venezuela
17 Nov 194761.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Maximiana in Numidia
22 Jun 196275.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Barquisimeto, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Enrique María Dubuc Moreno
Bishop Enrique María Dubuc Moreno (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Barquisimeto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoporo

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018