Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Settimio Caracciolo di Torchiarolo

Deceased

Bishop of Aversa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1862Born
30 May 188522.7Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
24 Mar 189835.5AppointedBishop of Alife, Italy
17 Apr 189835.6Ordained BishopBishop of Alife, Italy
10 Apr 191148.5AppointedBishop of Aversa, Italy
23 Nov 193068.2DiedBishop of Aversa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Settimio Caracciolo di Torchiarolo (VIAF: 89473714)
Bishop Settimio Caracciolo di Torchiarolo (born , died ) Bishop of Aversa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSt. John Lateran, Cathedral, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 90
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 75
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017