Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Fioravanti

Deceased

Bishop of Veroli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1841Born
23 Dec 186524.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 May 186624.4Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 189150.0AppointedBishop of Veroli, Italy
20 Dec 189150.0Ordained BishopBishop of Veroli, Italy
17 May 190967.4DiedBishop of Veroli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Fioravanti (VIAF: 233052222)
Bishop Paolo Fioravanti (born , died ) Bishop of Veroli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampagnano, Diocese of Nepi e Sutri
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 588
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017