Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Giles

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Philadelphia in Lydia

Titular See: (Rector/English College)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1830Born
24 Aug 185424.3Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 190474.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Lydia
13 Nov 190474.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Lydia
28 Jul 191383.2DiedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Lydia

MicroData Summary for William Giles
Bishop William Giles (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Philadelphia in Lydia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLondon, Great Britain

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018