Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Hanlon, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore}, Uganda

Titular Bishop of Teos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1862Born
21 Sep 188927.6Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
17 Jul 189432.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore}, Uganda
17 Jul 189432.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Teos
25 Nov 189432.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Teos
17 Nov 191149.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore}, Uganda
18 Aug 193775.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore}, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Henry Hanlon
Bishop Henry Hanlon M.H.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManchester, Diocese of Salford, England, Great Britain
Ordained BishopS. Silvestre in capite, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 539
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017