Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Quaroni

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Cyme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1833BornRoma
17 May 185623.2Ordained PriestPriest
8 Oct 189461.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyme
11 Nov 189461.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyme
20 Jan 189662.9DiedTitular Bishop of Cyme

MicroData Summary for Carlo Quaroni:
Bishop Carlo Quaroni (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Cyme

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 236

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013