Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father John A. Wall, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Kodok, Sudan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1879Born
20 Sep 190223.5Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
12 Aug 193859.4AppointedPrefect of Kodok, Sudan
1945¹65.8ResignedPrefect of Kodok, Sudan
26 Dec 195576.8DiedPrefect Emeritus of Kodok, Sudan

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John A. Wall
Father John A. Wall M.H.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Kodok

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWaterford, Co. Cork, Ireland

  • a priest for 53.2 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018