Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edvard Jan Nepomuk Brynych

Deceased

Bishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1846Born
23 Jul 186822.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Nov 186822.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 189246.6SelectedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
19 Jan 189346.7ConfirmedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
23 Mar 189346.8Ordained BishopBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
20 Nov 190256.5DiedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Edvard Jan Nepomuk Brynych (VIAF: 42886657)
Bishop Edvard Jan Nepomuk Brynych (born , died ) Bishop of Hradec Králové

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVlásenice, Diocese of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}
Ordained BishopSt. Esprit, Cathedral, Hradec Králové, Diocese of Hradec Králové

  • a priest for 34.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 479
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,893, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast